Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Raymond de Neckère, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1800BornWevelghem, Belgium
13 Oct 182222.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
4 Aug 182929.1AppointedBishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
24 Jun 183030.0Ordained BishopBishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
4 Sep 183333.2DiedBishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Leo Raymond de Neckère
Bishop Leo Raymond de Neckère C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of New Orleans

  • a priest for 10.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016