Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Pasquale Greco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1894Born
25 Jul 191823.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 194651.2AppointedBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
25 Feb 194651.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
10 May 197378.5RetiredBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
20 Jan 198792.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Pasquale Greco
Bishop Charles Pasquale Greco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alexandria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRodney

  • a priest for 68.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018