Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Louis Frey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lafayette, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1914BornNew Orleans, LA
2 Apr 193823.8Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
31 May 196753.0AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
8 Aug 196753.2Ordained BishopBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
7 Nov 197258.4AppointedBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
7 Jan 197358.6InstalledBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
13 May 198975.0RetiredBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
16 Aug 200793.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerard Louis Frey
Bishop Gerard Louis Frey (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lafayette

  • a priest for 69.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 17 Feb 2016