Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Shelton Joseph Fabre

Bishop of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1963 Born
5 Aug 198925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA
13 Dec 200643.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
13 Dec 200643.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
28 Feb 200743.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
23 Sep 201349.9AppointedBishop of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA
30 Oct 201350.0InstalledBishop of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Shelton Joseph Fabre
Bishop Shelton Joseph Fabre (born ) Bishop of Houma-Thibodaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Roads

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Houma-Thibodaux.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,342
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Sep 2013
  • i: Website of the Diocese, 24 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast