Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Francis Checchio

Bishop of Metuchen, New Jersey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1966 BornCamden, NJ
20 Jun 199226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Camden, New Jersey, USA
12 Dec 200539.6AppointedRector of the Pontifical North American College
16 Jan 200639.7InstalledRector of the Pontifical North American College
1 Feb 201649.7CeasedRector of the Pontifical North American College
8 Mar 201649.8AppointedBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
3 May 201650.0Ordained BishopBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for James Francis Checchio
Bishop James Francis Checchio (born ) Bishop of Metuchen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Metuchen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2016
  • ob: CB, 8 Mar 2016
  • c2: CB, 6 Apr 2016
  • c34: CB, 29 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 May 2016