Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Placide Louis Chapelle

Deceased

Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana

Apostolic Delegate to Cuba

Apostolic Delegate to Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1842BornRhunes, France
28 Jun 186522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
21 Aug 189149.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
21 Aug 189149.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arabissus
1 Nov 189149.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arabissus
10 May 189350.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
7 Jan 189451.4SucceededArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
1 Dec 189755.3AppointedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
16 Sep 189856.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Cuba
28 Sep 189957.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Philippines
9 Aug 190562.9DiedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Placide Louis Chapelle:
Archbishop Placide Louis Chapelle (born , died ) Archbishop of New Orleans

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 115, and Page 271
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 418, and Page 506

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013