Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Francis Rummel

Deceased

Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1876BornSteinmauern, Germany
24 May 190225.6Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
30 Mar 192851.5AppointedBishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
29 May 192851.6Ordained BishopBishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
4 Jul 192851.7InstalledBishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
9 Mar 193558.4AppointedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
8 Nov 196488.1DiedArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Francis Rummel:
Archbishop Joseph Francis Rummel (born , died ) Archbishop of New Orleans

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: CB, 20 Sep 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013