Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules Benjamin Jeanmard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lafayette, Louisiana

Titular Bishop of Bareta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1879BornPont-Breaux, LA
10 Jun 190323.8Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
18 Jul 191838.9AppointedBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
8 Dec 191839.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
13 Mar 195676.6RetiredBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
13 Mar 195676.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bareta
23 Feb 195777.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Jules Benjamin Jeanmard:
Bishop Jules Benjamin Jeanmard (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lafayette

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1918, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013