Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius Van de Ven

Deceased

Bishop of Alexandria, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1865BornOirschot, Netherlands
31 May 189025.0Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
10 Aug 190439.2AppointedBishop of Natchitoches, Louisiana, USA
30 Nov 190439.5Ordained BishopBishop of Natchitoches, Louisiana, USA
8 May 193266.9DiedBishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Van de Ven:
Bishop Cornelius Van de Ven (born , died ) Bishop of Alexandria

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 65
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013