Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clarence James Duhart, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Udon Thani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1912BornNew Orleans, LA, USA
2 Aug 193220.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
29 Jun 193725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
195340.7AppointedPrefect of Udonthani, Thailand
18 Dec 196553.7AppointedBishop of Udonthani, Thailand
21 Apr 196654.0Ordained BishopBishop of Udonthani, Thailand
2 Oct 197563.5ResignedBishop of Udon Thani, Thailand
21 Sep 199886.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Udon Thani, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Clarence James Duhart:
Bishop Clarence James Duhart C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Udon Thani

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015