Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Harold Robert Perry, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

Titular Bishop of Mons in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1916Born
6 Jan 194427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
29 Sep 196548.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
29 Sep 196548.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mons in Mauretania
6 Jan 196649.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mons in Mauretania
17 Jul 199174.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Harold Robert Perry
Bishop Harold Robert Perry S.V.D. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLake Charles
Ordained PriestBay St. Louis, MS

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Feb 2018