Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gregory Vath

Deceased

Bishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1918Born
7 Jun 194123.2Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 196647.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mobile-Birmingham, Alabama, USA
4 Mar 196647.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Novaliciana
26 May 196648.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novaliciana
29 Sep 196951.5AppointedBishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA
14 Jul 198769.3DiedBishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gregory Vath
Bishop Joseph Gregory Vath (born , died ) Bishop of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Orleans

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018