Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustave Augustin Rouxel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

Titular Bishop of Curium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1840Born
4 Nov 186323.7Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
10 Feb 189959.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
10 Feb 189959.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Curium
9 Apr 189959.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curium
16 Mar 190868.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Gustave Augustin Rouxel
Bishop Gustave Augustin Rouxel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRedon, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, New Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana
Death PlaceNew Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017