Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Mobile

Archidioecesis Mobiliensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Thomas John Rodi, Archbishop
  • Oscar Hugh Lipscomb, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Alabama and the Floridas
29 August 1825ErectedDiocese of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans) Vicariate Apostolic of Alabama and the Floridas (erected)
Diocese of Mobile
15 May 1829ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Alabama and the Floridas Diocese of Mobile (erected) (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
3 July 1850Territory LostDiocese of Charleston
Diocese of Mobile
Diocese of Savannah (erected)
19 July 1850Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Mobile (to New Orleans)
Diocese of Mobile-Birmingham
30 April 1954Name ChangedDiocese of Mobile Diocese of Mobile-Birmingham
28 June 1969SplitDiocese of Mobile-Birmingham Diocese of Birmingham
Diocese of Mobile
Diocese of Mobile
28 June 1969SplitDiocese of Mobile-Birmingham Diocese of Birmingham
Diocese of Mobile
1 October 1975Territory LostDiocese of Mobile
Diocese of Saint Augustine
Diocese of Pensacola-Tallahassee (erected)
Archdiocese of Mobile
29 July 1980ElevatedDiocese of Mobile Archdiocese of Mobile

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Mobile
195070,7393,048,8912.3%124178302234192630101ap1951
Diocese of Mobile-Birmingham
1966131,8644,402,3713.0%198216414318340829141ap1967
Diocese of Mobile
197042,5181,229,1313.5%708315327711435966ap1971
197648,3531,229,1313.9%789116928611728671ap1977
Archdiocese of Mobile
198054,8391,370,0004.0%84781623381511827373ap1981
199066,1191,526,1004.3%8957146452227024393ap1991
199966,0131,452,5064.5%10740147449411620176ap2000
200069,2141,452,5084.8%8244126549395619683ap2001
200166,3251,600,0204.1%9841139477375318176ap2002
200268,5821,640,6834.2%9535130527374617976ap2003
200364,8211,640,6834.0%9734131494634617076ap2004
200465,5881,652,3984.0%10132133493614215676ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 30 Jun 2013