Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanley Joseph Ott

Deceased

Bishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana


Graphics images used by permission of Diocese of Baton Rouge

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1927BornGretna
8 Dec 195124.4Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
24 May 197648.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
24 May 197648.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicives
29 Jun 197649.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicives
13 Jan 198355.5AppointedBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA
28 Nov 199265.4DiedBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Stanley Joseph Ott:
Bishop Stanley Joseph Ott (born , died ) Bishop of Baton Rouge

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 24 Sep 2013