Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfred Clifton Hughes

Archbishop Emeritus of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA


Graphics images used by permission of Diocese of Baton Rouge

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1932 Born
15 Dec 195725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
21 Jul 198148.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
21 Jul 198148.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximiana in Byzacena
14 Sep 198148.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximiana in Byzacena
7 Sep 199360.7AppointedBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA
4 Nov 199360.9InstalledBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA
16 Feb 200168.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
3 Jan 200269.0SucceededArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
12 Jun 200976.5RetiredArchbishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Alfred Clifton Hughes (VIAF: 6731400)
Archbishop Alfred Clifton Hughes (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of New Orleans.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast