Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert William Muench

Bishop Emeritus of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA


Graphics images used by permission of Diocese of Baton Rouge

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1942 Born
18 Jun 196825.4Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
8 May 199047.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
8 May 199047.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mactaris
29 Jun 199047.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mactaris
5 Jan 199653.0AppointedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
19 Mar 199653.2InstalledBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
15 Dec 200158.9AppointedBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA
14 Mar 200259.2InstalledBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA
26 Jun 201875.4RetiredBishop of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert William Muench
Bishop Robert William Muench (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Baton Rouge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLouisville, KY
Ordained BishopSaint Louis, Cathedral, New Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Baton Rouge.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,974
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 Jun 2018

Quantcast