Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Donald Borders

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Baltimore, Maryland, USA


Motto: Auscultabo Ut Serviam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1913Born
18 May 194026.6Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
22 Jul 196147.7IncardinatedPriest of Baton Rouge, Louisiana, USA
2 May 196854.5AppointedBishop of Orlando, Florida, USA
14 Jun 196854.6Ordained BishopBishop of Orlando, Florida, USA
25 Mar 197460.4AppointedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
26 Jun 197460.7InstalledArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
6 Apr 198975.4RetiredArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
19 Apr 201096.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary
William Donald Borders
Archbishop William Donald Borders
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWashington, IN

  • a priest for 69.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025