Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernand Joseph Cheri III, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

Titular Bishop of Membressa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1952 Born
20 May 197826.3Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
26 Aug 199644.5Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 Jan 201562.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
12 Jan 201562.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Membressa
23 Mar 201563.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Membressa

MicroData Summary for Fernand Joseph Cheri III (VIAF: 14194268)
Bishop Fernand Joseph Cheri III O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Orleans

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of New Orleans.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2015
  • ob: CB, 12 Jan 2015
  • c2: CB, 9 Feb 2015
  • c1: CB, 17 Mar 2015
  • c34: CB, 23 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017