Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Ignatius Peñalver y Cárdenas

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Guatemala

Titular Archbishop of Tricca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1749BornHavana, Cuba
4 Apr 177223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Cuba
17 Jun 179445.2SelectedBishop of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
12 Sep 179445.4ConfirmedBishop of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
26 Apr 179546.0Ordained BishopBishop of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
17 Jun 179546.2InstalledBishop of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans), USA
20 Jul 180152.2AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
9 May 180556.0ResignedArchbishop of Guatemala
9 May 180556.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tricca
17 Jul 181061.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Luis Ignatius Peñalver y Cárdenas
Archbishop Luis Ignatius Peñalver y Cárdenas (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Guatemala

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 209
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016