Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Pertíñez Fernández, O.A.R.

Bishop of Rio Branco, Acre, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1952 Born
16 Jul 197825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
24 Feb 199946.4AppointedBishop of Rio Branco, Acre, Brazil
30 May 199946.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rio Branco, Acre, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Pertíñez Fernández
Bishop Joaquín Pertíñez Fernández O.A.R. (born ) Bishop of Rio Branco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonachil, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rio Branco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,565

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast