Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Moreno y Mazón

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1825Born
4 Mar 187751.2SelectedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
20 Mar 187751.2ConfirmedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
25 Jul 187751.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
18 Nov 188155.9AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
27 Mar 188559.3AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
17 Jan 190579.1DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Moreno y Mazón
Archbishop José Moreno y Mazón (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMálaga, Diocese of Málaga
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 220, and Page 290
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 321
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 187
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017