Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaspar Cardinal ┴valos de la Cueva

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1485²Born
14 Nov 152439.8AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
22 Jan 152944.0AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
29 Mar 154257.2AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
19 Dec 154459.9Elevated to Cardinal
2 Nov 154560.8DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar ┴valos de la Cueva (VIAF: 231991585)
Gaspar Cardinal ┴valos de la Cueva (born 1485, died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadix, Diocese of Guadix
Death PlaceCompostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

  • a cardinal for .8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1544
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1,500, Page 38, Number 178
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204, and Page 206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 173
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,524, Number 37*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast