Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Balbino Santos y Olvera

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1887Born
16 Jul 191124.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 193548.3AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
27 Oct 193548.5Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga, Spain
24 Nov 194659.6AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
14 Feb 195365.8DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Balbino Santos y Olvera
Archbishop Balbino Santos y Olvera (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrbigo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1935, Number 85
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,919

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast