Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Valdés Llano

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1575Born
30 Apr 162549.7SelectedBishop of Teruel, Spain
9 Jul 162549.9ConfirmedBishop of Teruel, Spain
16 Nov 162550.3Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
18 Jul 163357.9AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
30 Dec 163964.4DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Valdés Llano
Archbishop Fernando Valdés Llano (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCangas de Tineo

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 331, and Page 196
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 147, Number 936
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018