Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Córdoba Ronquillo, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Sep 1630AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
Apr 1631³Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
14 Apr 1640SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
13 Aug 1640ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
24 Nov 1640DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Córdoba Ronquillo:
Bishop Luis Córdoba Ronquillo O.SS.T. (died ) Bishop of Trujillo

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137, and Page 347
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 153, Number 972

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015