Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvador José Reyes y García de Lara

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1780BornLa Zubía
2 Jan 184867.7SelectedBishop of Málaga, Spain
20 Jan 184867.8ConfirmedBishop of Málaga, Spain
24 Aug 184868.4Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga, Spain
6 Mar 185170.9SelectedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
5 Sep 185171.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
31 Mar 186585.0DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Salvador José Reyes y García de Lara:
Archbishop Salvador José Reyes y García de Lara (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,659
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 290, and Page 361
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 156, Number 855

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013