Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Javier Martínez Fernández

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1947 BornMadrid
3 Apr 197224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
20 Mar 198537.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
20 Mar 198537.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Voli
11 May 198537.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Voli
15 Mar 199648.2AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
15 Mar 200355.2AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
1 Jun 200355.4InstalledArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Martínez Fernández:
Archbishop Francisco Javier Martínez Fernández (born ) Archbishop of Granada

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Granada.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015