Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Jorge y Galván

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1717³BornZaragoza
27 Apr 176750.0AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
5 Jul 176750.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
29 Jan 177658.7AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
2 Sep 178770.3DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Jorge y Galván:
Archbishop Antonio Jorge y Galván (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,599
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 85, Number 427
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 228, and Page 449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015