Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Antonio Folgueras y Sión

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1769BornVillavaler
24 Jun 182454.5SelectedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
27 Sep 182454.8ConfirmedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
30 Jan 182555.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
2 Jan 184878.1SelectedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
17 Jan 184878.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
28 Oct 185080.9DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis Antonio Folgueras y Sión:
Archbishop Luis Antonio Folgueras y Sión (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 289
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 150
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 142, Number 768

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013