Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés de las Navas y Quevedo, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guatemala (Santiago de Guatemala)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632²BornBaza
26 Sep 164917.7ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
1660²28.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
13 Sep 167745.7AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
30 Nov 167846.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
23 Feb 167947.1InstalledBishop of Nicaragua
15 Jun 168250.5SelectedBishop of Guatemala (Santiago de Guatemala), Guatemala
15 Feb 168351.1ConfirmedBishop of Guatemala (Santiago de Guatemala), Guatemala
24 Mar 168351.2InstalledBishop of Guatemala (Santiago de Guatemala), Guatemala
2 Nov 170270.8DiedBishop of Guatemala (Santiago de Guatemala), Guatemala

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés de las Navas y Quevedo:
Bishop Andrés de las Navas y Quevedo O. de M. (died ) Bishop of Guatemala (Santiago de Guatemala)

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 216, and Page 287
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 218, Number 1,356

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013