Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel Santos de Sampedro

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1563¹Born
15 Apr 162461.2AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
23 Jun 162461.4Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
13 Nov 163067.8AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
1633²70.0DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Santos de Sampedro:
Archbishop Miguel Santos de Sampedro , Archbishop of Granada

  • a bishop for 8.5 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,395
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 144, and Page 196
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 146, Number 929

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015