Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Gil Tamayo

Bishop of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1957 Born
7 Sep 198023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Badajoz, Spain
28 Jul 199437.1IncardinatedPriest of Mérida-Badajoz, Spain
6 Nov 201861.4AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
15 Dec 201861.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for José María Gil Tamayo
Bishop José María Gil Tamayo (born ) Bishop of Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZalamea de la Serena, Diocese of Badajoz
Ordained BishopCristo Salvador, Cathedral, Ávila, Diocese of Ávila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ávila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2018
  • ob: CB, 6 Nov 2018
  • c2+: CB, 12 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Dec 2018

Quantcast