Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Escolano y Ledesma

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1609¹BornMadrid
26 Jun 165647.5AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
17 Dec 165648.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
19 Jul 166051.5AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
28 Nov 166354.9SelectedBishop of Segovia, Spain
17 Mar 166455.2ConfirmedBishop of Segovia, Spain
27 Feb 166859.2AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
4 Sep 167263.7DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Diego Escolano y Ledesma:
Archbishop Diego Escolano y Ledesma (died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a bishop for 15.7 years

Source(s):
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 186, Number 1,163
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 228, and Page 338
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 310
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013