Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Montero Moreno

Archbishop Emeritus of Mérida-Badajoz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1928 BornChurriana de la Vega
19 May 195122.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Apr 196940.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
4 Apr 196940.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Regiana
17 May 196940.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Regiana
3 May 198051.7AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
28 Jul 199465.9AppointedArchbishop of Mérida-Badajoz, Spain
9 Jul 200475.9RetiredArchbishop of Mérida-Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Montero Moreno:
Archbishop Antonio Montero Moreno (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mérida-Badajoz

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mérida-Badajoz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013