Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Portocarrero

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Dec 1523AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
1524²Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
26 Jun 1525AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
5 Jun 1526DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Portocarrero:
Archbishop Pedro Portocarrero (died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a bishop for 2.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 37, Number 171
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 168, and Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Nov 2013