Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicente Cardinal Casanova y Marzol

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1854BornBorja
1881²26.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tarazona, Spain
19 Dec 190753.7AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
25 Mar 190853.9Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
7 Mar 192166.9AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
30 Mar 192571.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 192571.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio
23 Oct 193076.5DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Casanova y Marzol:
Cardinal Vicente Casanova y Marzol (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
  • a cardinal for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 187, and Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013