Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Onésimo Salamanca Zaldívar

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1687³Born
14 Dec 173952.4AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
25 Feb 174052.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
20 Mar 175264.6AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
19 Dec 175770.4AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
14 Jan 176173.5DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Onésimo Salamanca Zaldívar
Archbishop Onésimo Salamanca Zaldívar (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBriviesca

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 59, Number 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1740, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 134, and Page 228
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast