Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hernando de Talavera, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1428¹Born
26 Aug 148557.6AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
23 Jan 149365.0AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
14 May 150779.3DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hernando de Talavera (VIAF: 22226043)
Archbishop Hernando de Talavera O.S.H. (born 1428, died ) Archbishop of Granada

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPalencia, Diocese of Palencia

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,452
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 78, and Page 161
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1485, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Dec 2018

Quantcast