Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martín Ascargorta

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1639Born
7 Nov 168950.8AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
24 Feb 169051.1Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
18 May 169354.3AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
25 Feb 171980.1DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Martín Ascargorta
Archbishop Martín Ascargorta (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVergara
Ordained BishopGranada, Archdiocese of Granada

  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 211, and Page 339
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 232, Number 1,442
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast