Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alcaraz y Belluga

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarazona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1702³Born
7 Aug 174139.5AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
3 Sep 174139.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
31 Jul 175553.5ResignedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
26 Jan 178583.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Alcaraz y Belluga
Bishop José Alcaraz y Belluga (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarazona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMotril

  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 60, Number 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 49
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 409
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast