Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Bernardo de los Ríos y Guzmán, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626²BornGranada
17 Sep 166842.7AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
1669²43.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cuba
16 Nov 167145.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
13 Sep 167751.7AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
5 Oct 169266.8DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Bernardo de los Ríos y Guzmán:
Archbishop Alfonso Bernardo de los Ríos y Guzmán O.SS.T. (died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 204, Number 1,279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013