Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Manuel Moscoso y Peralta

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1723BornMoquegua
1755²31.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
15 Oct 176946.7SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Arequipa, Peru
12 Mar 177047.1ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Arequipa, Peru
12 Mar 177047.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
1771²47.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
17 Jun 177148.4AppointedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
22 Aug 177350.6InstalledBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
28 Sep 177855.7AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
30 May 178966.3SelectedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
3 Aug 178966.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
26 Nov 178966.8InstalledArchbishop of Granada, Spain
24 Jul 181188.5DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Moscoso y Peralta:
Archbishop Juan Manuel Moscoso y Peralta (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • op/c1: LB, 20 Apr 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 190, and Page 228
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 416, and Page 420
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015