Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Diego Ventaja Milán

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1880Born
1 May 193554.8AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
29 Jun 193555.0Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
30 Aug 193656.2DiedBishop of Almería, Spain
10 Oct 1993Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Diego Ventaja Milán
Bishop Bl. Diego Ventaja Milán (born , died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOhanes

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast