Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Luis Ysern de Arce

Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Ancud


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1930 BornValencia, Spain
29 Jun 195323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Granada, Spain
12 Apr 197241.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antofagasta, Chile
12 Apr 197241.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Guardialfiera
7 May 197242.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Guardialfiera
20 May 197242.0InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of Antofagasta, Chile
20 May 197242.0AppointedAdministrator of Calama, Chile
13 May 197444.0AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
2 Jun 197444.1ResignedAdministrator of Calama, Chile
15 Jun 197444.1InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
15 Sep 200575.4RetiredBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile

MicroData Summary for Juan Luis Ysern de Arce:
Bishop Juan Luis Ysern de Arce (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Ancud

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Carlos de Ancud.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013