Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blas Tineo Palacios, O. de M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Granada

Titular Bishop of Thermopylae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1586BornMadrid
22 Sep 163650.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Granada, Spain
22 Sep 163650.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
4 Jan 163751.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
Jun 165468.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Blas Tineo Palacios:
Bishop Blas Tineo Palacios O. de M. Auxiliary Bishop of Granada

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013