Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Eustaquio Perea Porras

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1666³BornAlbuñuelas
6 Dec 170539.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 171548.8AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
Nov 1715³48.9Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
3 Jul 172053.6AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
26 Jun 173366.6DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Eustaquio Perea Porras:
Archbishop Francisco Eustaquio Perea Porras (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,622
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 211, and Page 316
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 33, Number 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015