Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Hurtado y García

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1896BornArenas del Rey
20 Dec 191923.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 194346.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Granada, Spain
13 Jan 194346.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bilta
2 May 194347.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bilta
24 Apr 194751.1AppointedBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
12 Oct 194751.5InstalledBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
12 Jan 196669.8DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Hurtado y García:
Bishop Manuel Hurtado y García (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013