Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Castro Quiñones

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1534BornRoa
6 Dec 158955.6AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
18 May 159056.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Granada, Spain
5 Jul 161076.1AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
20 Dec 162389.6DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Castro Quiñones:
Archbishop Pedro Castro Quiñones (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,819
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 205
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 102, Number 646
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 15 Dec 2013