Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martín Carrillo Alderete

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1633AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
20 May 1633Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
9 Jun 1636AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
1 Jul 1641AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
29 Jun 1653DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Martín Carrillo Alderete:
Archbishop Martín Carrillo Alderete (died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013